OH HB26 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5739.02 of the Revised Code to exempt from sales and use taxes the sale or use of investment metal bullion and coins.
Title
Exempts investment metal from sales tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-06-17 | House | Passed |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported: Ways and Means |
2015-02-10 | House | To committee: Ways and Means |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 39 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |