OH HB277 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-15 - To State Government Oversight & Reform
Pending: Senate State Government Oversight & Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-15 - To State Government Oversight & Reform
Pending: Senate State Government Oversight & Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 709.02 and 709.023 of the Revised Code to require that the state or a political subdivision real estate owner be included in determining the number of owners needed to sign a petition for an expedited type-II annexation, unless the real estate is a road or road right-of-way, and to make other changes regarding that type of annexation.
Title
To require that the state or a political subdivision real estate owner be included in determining the number of owners needed to sign a petition for an expedited type-II annexation, unless the real estate is a road or road right-of-way, and to make other changes regarding that type of annexation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-14 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2014-05-15 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-05-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-02-26 | Committee Report | |
2013-09-30 | To State and Local Government | |
2013-09-30 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
7 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 09 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 09 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 09 | 023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 09 | 033 | Amended Code | Citation Text |