OH HB301 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Referred to committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Referred to committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1701.86, 1702.27, 1702.30, 1702.33, 1702.38, 1702.521, 1702.53, 1702.55, and 1745.05 and to enact sections 1702.341 and 1702.531 of the Revised Code to amend the Nonprofit Corporation Law and the law governing dissolving corporations.
Title
Regards Nonprofit Corporation Law and dissolving corporations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | Referred to committee: Judiciary |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported - Substitute: Civil Justice |
2023-10-24 | House | Referred to committee: Civil Justice |
2023-10-18 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 01 | 86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 02 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 02 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 02 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 02 | 341 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 02 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 02 | 521 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 02 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 02 | 531 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 02 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 45 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |