OH HB51 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5517.06 of the Revised Code to require the Ohio Department of Transportation to install rumble strips along the center line for all two-way, undivided state highways with a speed limit exceeding 45 miles per hour, as a part of specified highway projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require center-line rumble strips for certain highway projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateIntroduced
2019-06-27HousePassed
2019-06-19HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
55New CodeSee Bill Text
5517New CodeSee Bill Text
551706New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback