OH HB616 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 5534.415, 5534.417, 5534.418, 5534.421, 5534.511, 5534.54, 5534.819, 5534.821, 5534.828, 5534.835, 5534.836, 5534.837, 5534.838, 5534.872, 5534.899, 5534.912, 5534.914, 5534.915, and 5534.921 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of Interstate Route 275 in Hamilton County as the "Officer Kaia L. Grant Memorial Highway" and make other memorial designations.
Title
Designate part of I-75 the Officer Kaia L. Grant Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed - Amended |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported: Transportation and Public Safety |
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2020-05-06 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Special Designations
Special Designations : Memorial Highways and Bridges
Transportation
Special Designations
Special Designations : Memorial Highways and Bridges
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 34 | 415 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 417 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 418 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 421 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 511 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 819 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 821 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 828 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 835 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 836 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 837 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 838 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 872 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 899 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 912 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 914 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 915 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 921 | New Code | See Bill Text |