OH HB67 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 2108.31 of the Revised Code to permit persons who are sixteen to donate blood with parental consent.
Title
To permit persons who are sixteen to donate blood with parental consent.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2009-07-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-06 | Effective Date | |
2009-07-07 | Governor' Action | |
2009-07-18 | End of 10-day period | |
2009-07-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-07-06 | Concurrence | |
2009-07-06 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2009-06-29 | Committee Report | |
2009-04-01 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2009-04-01 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-03-26 | Committee Report | |
2009-03-10 | To State Government | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 08 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |