OH HB8 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-16)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2007 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2007-06-19 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2007 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2007-06-19 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Summary
To amend sections 145.27, 145.56, 145.82, 145.95, 742.41, 742.47, 3305.07, 3305.20, 3307.20, 3307.41, 3309.22, 3309.66, 3309.82, 3309.95, 5505.04, and 5505.22 and to enact sections 145.572, 742.463, 2901.43, 3305.11, 3307.372, 3309.672, and 5505.262 of the Revised Code to provide that a member of a state retirement system, on conviction of a felony committed in the course of official duties, will forfeit the portion of any state retirement benefit that is based on employer contributions.
Title
State pension - forfeit if on-duty felony
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-19 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2007-06-19 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-06-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-06-12 | Committee Report | |
2007-02-20 | To State Government & Elections | |
2007-02-20 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_8 |