OH HB86 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 62-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Effective 3/11/19 - Certain provisions effective 03/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 62-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Effective 3/11/19 - Certain provisions effective 03/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2923.11 of the Revised Code to correct a drafting error in the definition of "dangerous ordnance" that resulted from Am. Sub. H.B. 228 of the 132nd General Assembly and to declare an emergency.
Title
Correct error in definition of "dangerous ordnance"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Effective 3/11/19 - Certain provisions effective 03/28/2019 | |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Informally passed |
2019-02-21 | House | Informally passed |
2019-02-21 | House | Reported - Amended: Federalism |
2019-02-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Federalism |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Firearms
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Firearms
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 23 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |