OH SB173 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2521 of the Revised Code to designate September as "Hirschsprung's Disease Awareness Month."
Title
Designate Hirschsprung's Disease Awareness Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Passed |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Introduced |