OH SB24 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 60-21)
Status: Passed on August 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 60-21)
Status: Passed on August 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 5.2279 of the Revised Code to designate October 15 as "Pregnancy and Infant Loss Remembrance Day."
Title
To designate October 15 as "Pregnancy and Infant Loss Remembrance Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-15 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-16 | Governor' Action | |
2013-05-18 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-05-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | Concurrence | |
2013-03-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-03-12 | Committee Report | |
2013-02-12 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-02-12 | Introduced to House | |
2013-04-30 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-04-24 | Committee Report | |
2013-03-20 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-03-20 | Introduced to Senate |