OH SB57 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 2108.31 of the Revised Code to permit persons who are sixteen to donate blood with parental consent.
Title
To permit persons who are sixteen to donate blood with parental consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-04-21 | Committee Report | |
2009-02-26 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced to House | |
2009-06-04 | Committee Report | |
2009-04-23 | To *Rules & Reference | |
2009-04-23 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 08 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |