OH SB59 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Reported - Substitute: Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Reported - Substitute: Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4729.44 and 4729.51 of the Revised Code to require the State Board of Pharmacy to educate certain license holders about the law authorizing naloxone dispensing without a prescription and to authorize other license holders to sell drugs occasionally at wholesale.
Title
Require pharmacist education regarding naloxone dispensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2019-10-29 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2019-10-25 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |