OH SB97 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2152.17, 2901.08, 2923.14, 2929.13, 2929.14, 2929.20, 2929.201, 2941.141, 2941.144, 2941.145, 2941.146, and 2941.1412 and to enact sections 2923.132 and 2941.1424 of the Revised Code to increase by 50% the mandatory prison term for an offender who is convicted of a firearm specification and previously has been convicted of a firearm specification; to prohibit violent career criminals from knowingly acquiring, having, carrying, or using any firearm or dangerous ordnance; to require a mandatory prison term for a violent career criminal convicted of committing a violent felony offense while armed with a firearm; to correct a provision regarding delinquent child dispositions for specifications; to provide certain prisoners credit for time spent in jail in determining eligibility to apply for judicial release; and to specify that no presentence investigation report is required for shock probation to be granted to an offender convicted of an offense before July 1, 1996.
Title
Addresses firearm penalties and various criminal sentencing
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hughes [R] | Sen. Frank LaRose [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Effective 9/14/16 | |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed - Amended |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported - Amended: Judiciary |
2015-05-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2015-04-30 | House | Introduced |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Juvenile and Family Law : Juvenile Justice
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Juvenile and Family Law : Juvenile Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 52 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 01 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 23 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 23 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 29 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 41 | 141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 41 | 1412 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 41 | 1424 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 41 | 144 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 41 | 145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 41 | 146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |