OK HB1012 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; repealing sections of Enrolled House Bill 1010 of the 2nd Extraordinary Session of the 56th Legislature; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; repealing sections of Enrolled House Bill 1010 of the 2nd Extraordinary Session of the 56th Legislature; emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Approved by Governor 04/10/2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2018-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-29 | House | Ayes: 65 Nays: 24 |
2018-03-29 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2018-03-29 | House | Ayes: 65 Nays: 22 |
2018-03-29 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2018-03-29 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wallace |
2018-03-29 | House | Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 24 |
2018-03-29 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wallace |
2018-03-29 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 26 |
2018-03-29 | House | Ayes: 59 Nays: 21 |
2018-03-29 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2018-03-29 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-29 | House | General Order |
2018-03-26 | House | Withdrawn from Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Casey |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |