OK HB1032 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1032
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of residential building design elements; prohibiting county and municipal regulation of residential building design elements; exceptions; effective date.
Title
Regulation of residential building design elements; prohibiting county and municipal regulation of residential building design elements; exceptions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Newhouse, Leewright, Stanislawski, McCortney, Brooks, Young |
2019-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 25 |
2019-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Martinez |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1032 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Died in conference