OK HB1040 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Purple Heart Day; changing Purple Heart Week to Purple Heart Day; effective date.
Title
Purple Heart Day; changing Purple Heart Week to Purple Heart Day; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2015-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Derby |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-17 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |