OK HB1075 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1075
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; requiring standardized assessment for every child taken into custody by the Department of Human Services; effective date.
Title
Children; requiring standardized assessment for every child taken into custody by the Department of Human Services; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Scott (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter, Bennett, Lawson, Mize, Pae, Randleman, Smith, Hasenbeck, Grego, Rosecrants, Fugate, Stark, Sims |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2019-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1075 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019