OK HB1335 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1335
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Protected Cell Companies Act; effective date.
Title
Insurance; creating the Protected Cell Companies Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Approved by Governor 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-07 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 5 |
2019-05-07 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 26 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire |
2019-02-27 | House | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sims |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1335 (Carry Over) 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019