OK HB1410 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Developmental disability programs; rents; royalties.
Title
Developmental disability programs; rents; royalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2015-03-02 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Billy |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |