OK HB1588 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Parental Notification for Abortion Act; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Parental Notification for Abortion Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/24/2013 |
2013-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-16 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 5 |
2013-05-16 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance) |
2013-05-16 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2013-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12 |
2013-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs, Christian, Vaughan, Kern, Fisher |
2013-03-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hulbert, Ritze |
2013-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hamilton |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 740 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 744 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |