OK HB1773 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Commercial Code; amending sections relating to secured transactions; effective date.
Title
Uniform Commercial Code; amending sections relating to secured transactions; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 64 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Banking and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 64 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Banking and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 06/04/2015 |
2015-05-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | coauthored by Sparks |
2015-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2015-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2015-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 |
2015-05-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ |
2015-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2015-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Sykes, Crain, Dahm, Treat, Sparks, Floyd |
2015-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Banking and Financial Services |
2015-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | coauthored by Sharp |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-03 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Financial Services Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Financial Services |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12A | 1 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12A | 2A | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |