OK HB1781 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public Health and Safety; central repository information; adding certain state departments that may access certain information; effective date.
Title
Public Health and Safety; central repository information; adding certain state departments that may access certain information; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2013 |
2013-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5 |
2013-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2013-03-06 | House | General Order |
2013-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Health Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |