OK HB1830 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; modifying residence requirement for county commissioners; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; modifying residence requirement for county commissioners; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2013 |
2013-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-09 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2013-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11 |
2013-02-28 | House | General Order |
2013-02-07 | House | Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Armes |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |