OK HB1874 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma Tax Commission; municipal lodging taxes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma Tax Commission; municipal lodging taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/31/2013 |
2013-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-16 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-16 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-14 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-14 | House | CCR submitted, GCCA |
2013-05-02 | House | HC's named: GCCA |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-11 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | House | Motion expired |
2013-03-06 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McCall |
2013-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4; Ayes: 54 Nays: 37 |
2013-03-06 | House | General Order |
2013-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |