OK HB1912 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal procedure; changing applicability of certain protective order requirements; counseling services; arrests; modifying procedure for setting certain bond; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; changing applicability of certain protective order requirements; counseling services; arrests; modifying procedure for setting certain bond; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R] | Sen. Susan Paddack [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor 05/03/2013 |
2013-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-15 | Senate | coauthored by Paddack |
2013-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2013-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Echols |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Dustin) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | House | General Order |
2013-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Shannon |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 60 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 60 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 60 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 60 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |