OK HB1925 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1925
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Courts Supreme Court; clarifying terms of office; modifying judicial districts; Court of Criminal Appeals; modifying judicial districts; effective date.
Title
Courts Supreme Court; clarifying terms of office; modifying judicial districts; Court of Criminal Appeals; modifying judicial districts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Laid over |
2017-05-25 | House | Considered |
2017-05-23 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2017-05-23 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Downing |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Dahm, Sykes, Smalley, Standridge, Newhouse, Floyd, Sparks |
2017-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 16 |
2017-03-21 | House | Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-21 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-21 | House | Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1925 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Laid over