OK HB2152 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2152
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Maternal mortality; modifying membership of the Maternal Mortality Review Committee; requiring hospital or birthing center to report certain deaths to the Chief Medical Examiner Office; broadening types of deaths to be investigated; production of records; effective date.
Title
Maternal mortality; modifying membership of the Maternal Mortality Review Committee; requiring hospital or birthing center to report certain deaths to the Chief Medical Examiner Office; broadening types of deaths to be investigated; production of records; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Sen. Jo Dossett [D] | Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] | Rep. John Waldron [D] |
Rep. Ellyn Hefner [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hefner |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2023-03-06 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Dossett (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Roe |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2152 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services