OK HB2273 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prisons and reformatories; parole considerations; modifying categories; authorizing Board to establish accelerated parole process for certain inmates; revocations; discharge credits; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisons and reformatories; parole considerations; modifying categories; authorizing Board to establish accelerated parole process for certain inmates; revocations; discharge credits; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseEnacting clause restored
2019-05-20HouseTitle restored
2019-05-20HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Ikley-Freeman
2019-05-20HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named Jech, Daniels, Bice, Coleman, Brooks, Floyd, Shaw, Matthews
2019-05-01HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-15Senatecoauthored by Dunnington
2019-04-03SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-03SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-01SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-01SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 13
2019-03-13HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseAuthored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative West (Josh)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2273&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2273%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2273%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2273%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2273%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2273%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2273%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2273_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2273_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback