OK HB2320 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Teachers' Retirement System; Deferred Retirement Option Plan; modifying provisions related to authorized investments; modifying provisions related to assumptions for COLA; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public retirement systems; Teachers' Retirement System; Deferred Retirement Option Plan; modifying provisions related to authorized investments; modifying provisions related to assumptions for COLA; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-22 | CCR read | |
2012-05-22 | To Senate | |
2012-05-22 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 | |
2012-05-22 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | Title restored | |
2012-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Anderson, Brown, Mazzei, Aldridge, Adelson, Paddack | |
2012-04-26 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development | |
2012-04-23 | SA's received | |
2012-04-23 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-19 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-04-02 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-04-02 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-20 | First Reading | |
2012-02-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 | |
2012-02-16 | General Order | |
2012-02-09 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-02-09 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 49 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 49 | 122 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 312 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |