OK HB2344 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Labor; Boiler and Pressure Vessel Safety Act; removing certain fee; effective date.
Title
Labor; Boiler and Pressure Vessel Safety Act; removing certain fee; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 8 |
2014-02-26 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Withdrawn from Insurance Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 141 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 141 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |