OK HB2367 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; increasing travel allowance for certain county officers.
Title
Counties and county officers; increasing travel allowance for certain county officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Shortey, Treat, Allen, Dahm, Ballenger, Sparks |
2014-05-05 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on General Government |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 16 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, considered and deferred |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 9 |
2014-03-12 | House | Amended |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | Emergency removed |
2014-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred to General Government Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Trebilcock |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |