OK HB2375 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Soldiers and sailors; providing for recodification; effective date.
Title
Soldiers and sailors; providing for recodification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Approved by Governor 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-05 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-05 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-05 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-15 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hardin |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |