OK HB2377 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2377
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; gross production taxes; limiting period where certain exemptions and rebates may be claimed; economically at-risk oil or gas leases; payment schedule; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; gross production taxes; limiting period where certain exemptions and rebates may be claimed; economically at-risk oil or gas leases; payment schedule; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by Governor 05/25/2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2017-05-20 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-19 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2017-05-19 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols |
2017-05-19 | House | Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 6 |
2017-05-19 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols |
2017-05-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 7 |
2017-05-19 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-05-19 | House | General Order |
2017-05-08 | House | Emergency added |
2017-05-08 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-24 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2017-04-20 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-04-20 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace |
2017-04-20 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2377 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017