OK HB2527 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Vetoed 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Vetoed 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; creating the Domestic Violence Legal Aid Revolving Fund income tax checkoff; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; creating the Domestic Violence Legal Aid Revolving Fund income tax checkoff; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] |
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Vetoed 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-30 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 16 |
2014-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-03-24 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Hoskin |
2014-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 16 |
2014-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Sherrer |
2014-02-24 | House | General Order |
2014-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Ivester (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Floyd |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |