OK HB2534 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Ad Valorem Tax Code; county board of equalization; hearing requirements; affidavits; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Ad Valorem Tax Code; county board of equalization; hearing requirements; affidavits; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: General Government committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: General Government committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 9 |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on General Government |
2014-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 12 |
2014-03-03 | House | General Order |
2014-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Watson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |