OK HB2687 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2687
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Law Enforcement Retirement System; election to participate; members; transfer of contributions and records; credit; effective dates; emergency.
Title
Public retirement systems; Law Enforcement Retirement System; election to participate; members; transfer of contributions and records; credit; effective dates; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-12 | House | Emergency added |
2024-03-12 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2023-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-13 | House | Remove Representative Lepak as principal House author and substitute with Representative George |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Lepak |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2687 (Carry Over) 2023-02-27 - Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act