OK HB2717 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2717
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Poor persons; Family Support Program; eligibility; maximum payment; amount; effective date.
Title
Poor persons; Family Support Program; eligibility; maximum payment; amount; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellyn Hefner [D] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Mickey Dollens [D] | Rep. Trish Ranson [D] |
Rep. Suzanne Schreiber [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson, Schreiber |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hefner |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2717 (Carry Over) 2023-02-27 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee