OK HB2811 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; enacting the State Sovereignty Act; creating the Federal Tax Fund; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public finance; enacting the State Sovereignty Act; creating the Federal Tax Fund; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House: States' Rights Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States' Rights Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to States' Rights Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from General Government Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |