OK HB2941 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; requiring pharmacies to maintain electronic records of nonprescription pseudoephedrine or ephedrine sales; requirements; effective date. Emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; requiring pharmacies to maintain electronic records of nonprescription pseudoephedrine or ephedrine sales; requirements; effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 23 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 23 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-02 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 | |
2012-05-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Nollan | |
2012-05-02 | SA's read, adopted | |
2012-04-18 | SA's received | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-17 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-17 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-04-17 | Title restored | |
2012-04-17 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-09 | Emergency added | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-28 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-13 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 5 | |
2012-03-13 | Amended | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-22 | Authored by Senator Brinkley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2012-02-22 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Derby | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 309C | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |