OK HB3032 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure; judgments; dormancy; effective date.
Title
Civil procedure; judgments; dormancy; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Bush [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules |
2020-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Bush |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3032&Session=2000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB3032%20INT.PDF |