OK HB3304 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - SA's ruled nongermane
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - SA's ruled nongermane
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishment; modifying inclusions on violent crimes; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishment; modifying inclusions on violent crimes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | SA's ruled nongermane |
2018-05-03 | House | SA's considered |
2018-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |