OK HB3369 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crossbows; prohibiting the sale of or providing a crossbow to any child with exception; codification; effective date.
Title
Crossbows; prohibiting the sale of or providing a crossbow to any child with exception; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 15 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Motion expired |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Smalley |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 26 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 27 |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 53 Nays: 20 |
2018-03-05 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wallace |
2018-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 54 |
2018-03-05 | House | General Order |
2018-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |