OK HB3426 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; transportation space vehicle; income tax credit; tax years; eligibility; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; transportation space vehicle; income tax credit; tax years; eligibility; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Archer [R] | Sen. John Haste [R] | Rep. Clay Staires [R] | Rep. Annie Menz [D] |
Rep. Arturo Alonso-Sandoval [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Staires |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Finance Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval |
2024-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 28 |
2024-03-06 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Archer |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |