OK HB3469 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; creating the Quinten Douglas Wood Act of 2014; effective date.
Title
Children; creating the Quinten Douglas Wood Act of 2014; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2 |
2014-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Ivester |
2014-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named David, Crain, Treat, Griffin, Shumate, Ballenger |
2014-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Human Services |
2014-04-15 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Pittman |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |