OK HB3499 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; leases; Affordable Housing Tax Credit Program; procedures; effective date.
Title
Landlord and tenant; leases; Affordable Housing Tax Credit Program; procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Finance Committee |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pae |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Swope |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval |
2024-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 3 |
2024-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill, Dollens, Moore, Waldron, Humphrey, Blancett, Lepak, Lowe (Jason), Schreiber, Munson |
2024-03-07 | House | General Order |
2024-03-07 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Miller, Roberts |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Tammy) |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |