OK HB4015 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Coauthored by Senator Rogers
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Coauthored by Senator Rogers
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; Oklahoma State Department of Education; training program; threat intervention school staff and faculty; effective date.
Title
Schools; Oklahoma State Department of Education; training program; threat intervention school staff and faculty; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Brenda Stanley [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] |
Sen. Cody Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 40 |
2024-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill |
2024-03-04 | House | General Order |
2024-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |