OK HB4017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; creating the Return to Teach Signing Bonus Act; emergency.
Title
Teachers; creating the Return to Teach Signing Bonus Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Rep. John Waldron [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fugate |
2024-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 16 |
2024-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2024-03-06 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Emergency added |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |