OK HCR1023 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Religious freedom; encouraging celebration of Religious Freedom Day; distribution.
Title
Religious freedom; encouraging celebration of Religious Freedom Day; distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2012-05-24 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-24 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-23 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-23 | Adopted, returned to House | |
2012-05-23 | Considered | |
2012-05-23 | Direct to Calendar | |
2012-03-29 | First Reading | |
2012-03-29 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-28 | Authored by Senator Brinkley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-28 | Considered | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Kern | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced |