OK HJR1001 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Constitution; ad valorem taxation; senior freeze; homestead exemption; qualifying income limit; ballot title; filing.
Title
Oklahoma Constitution; ad valorem taxation; senior freeze; homestead exemption; qualifying income limit; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Died in conference | |
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, SCs named Mazzei, Brinkley, Ford, Halligan, Adelson, Wilson | |
2012-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2012-04-25 | SA's received | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 | |
2012-04-24 | coauthored by Jolley | |
2012-04-24 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-21 | coauthored by Holt | |
2012-03-21 | coauthored by Tibbs | |
2012-03-21 | Remove as author Senator Reynolds; authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2012-03-21 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13 | |
2011-03-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hamilton, Shumate, Kern, Faught, Reynolds, Ritze, Inman | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | Authored by Senator Reynolds (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Dank | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |