OK HJR1101 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Board of Governors of the Licensed Architects, Landscape Architects and Registered Interior Designers of Oklahoma; distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Board of Governors of the Licensed Architects, Landscape Architects and Registered Interior Designers of Oklahoma; distribution.
Sponsors
Rep. George Faught [R] | Sen. John Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House: , THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by Governor 05/22/2012 | |
2012-05-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-15 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-15 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 | |
2012-05-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-04-17 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-03-29 | First Reading | |
2012-03-29 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-28 | Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-28 | General Order | |
2012-03-26 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-03-14 | Authored by Representative Faught | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading |